Collection search - Binscarth
-
Record information – Brief Binscarth
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Portage - MarquetteEstablished:1887-07-01Province:ManitobaReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:9682 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Civil Service CommissionGRD 02 - 1981-10-01GRD 03 - 1966-04-01GRD 03 - 1969-04-01GRD 03 - 1973-04-01GRD 03 - 1976-01-01GRD 03 - 1977-03-01PO-1580-1 (Semi-Staff)PWDSec. 10, Twp. 19, R. 28, WPM - 1887-07-01Sec. 15, Twp. 19, R. 28, W - 1920-10-01Semi-Staff - 1948-04-01Source:PSFDS03-(8080)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy A.P.W. Goldsmid 1887-07-01 1888-10-19 Left the place A.G.B. Smellie 1889-03-01 1897-05-01 Resignation Alexander S. Crerar 1897-09-01 1911-12-11 Dismissal (Political Partisanship) Mrs. Thomas Fowler 1912-01-18 1920-06-21 Resignation Joseph Harold Willis OAS 1882-12-31 1920-10-01 1949-10-01 Retirement Arthur James Willis OAS * 1949-06-17 Acting Arthur James Willis OAS * 1950-06-17 1964-02-01 Promoted Mrs. Isabelle Clements * 1964-02-02 Acting Robert Russell Rannie OAS * 1964-06-02 1978-06-03 Deceased Robert Russell Rannie OAS * 1964-06-02 Acting Mrs. Isabelle Clements * 1978-06-05 1983-12-30 Deceased Mrs. Doreen H. Orr 1983-12-31 1984-02-20 Ralph Schmitke 1984-02-20 1985-01-12 Lesley Sawchuk 1985-01-13 1985-08-01 Acting Lois Power 1985-08-01 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.