Collection search - Griersville
-
Record information – Brief Griersville
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Grey N.R.Date(s):Established Closing 1854-04-01 1914-04-30 Province:OntarioReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:9648 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Grey Cty, St. Vincent - 1854-04-01Source:PSFDS03-(1845)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Andrew Grier 1854-04-01 1857-06-23 Resignation William Grier 1857-09-01 1858 Removed from Province Andrew Grier 1858-07-01 1872-05-10 Resignation Robert Burdett 1872-07-01 Acting James Marshall 1875-01-01 1888-06-05 Resignation George Lindsay 1888-10-01 1900-05-05 Resignation William Taylor 1900-07-01 1910 Resignation Frederick Pleivis 1910-05-25 1912-09-17 Resignation E.H. Knoll 1913-06-16 1914-04-30 Closed *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.