Collection search - Les Fonds
-
Record information – Brief Les Fonds
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:LotbiniereEstablished:1887-02-01Province:QuebecReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:926 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Bureau ferme le 15 aout 1969DwellingGrocery storeLocation - St. Antoine de Tilly - 1887-02-01Source:PSFDS03-(26673)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy F. X. Dion 1887-02-01 1888-01-15 Resignation Zoel Desroches 1888-05-01 1894-12-14 Resignation Jos. Garneau 1895-04-01 1897-01-08 Removal of PO Charles Bergeron 1897-03-01 1913-02-14 Dismissal, political partisanship Chas. Eusebe Croteau 1913-03-11 1913-04-29 Resignation Emile Boisvert 1913-05-12 1926-07-20 Resignation Alidor Bergeron 1892-05 1926-11-26 1945-04-05 Resignation Armand Methot 1898-08-06 1945-05-22 1946-02-04 Resignation Joseph Tanguay * 1946-05-04 1956-10-29 Resignation Herve Rousseau * 1956-10-29 Acting Herve Rousseau * 1957-01-10 1958-04-08 Resignation Mrs. Madeleine Caron * 1958-05-14 Acting Mrs. Madeleine Caron * 1959-02-11 1964-12-26 Resignation Mrs. Azilda Lamontagne * 1965-05-01 Acting Mrs. Azilda Lamontagne * 1965-05-28 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.