Collection search - Boulanger
-
Record information – Brief Boulanger
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Lac - St. JeanEstablished:1921-11-26Province:QuebecReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:8694 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Location - Dolbeau - 1921-11-26Source:PSFDS03-(24784)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Reverend D.A. Boulanger 1921-11-26 1928-05-24 Resignation Ambroise Larouche 1928-06-09 1932-02-23 Dismissal, political partisanship Osias Cote 1932-07-05 1936-12-20 Change in site Arthur Verreault 1937-01-21 1952-06-11 Resignation Ernest Lavoie 1897-01-25 1952-06-11 Acting Ernest Lavoie 1897-01-25 1952-07-29 1960-02-05 Death Mrs Anna Rose Lavoie Dovin * 1960-02-06 Acting Archelas Veilleux * 1960-06-09 1969-11-19 Resignation, Sup'n Rene Veilleux * 1969-11-20 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.