Collection search - Neilburg
-
Record information – Brief Neilburg
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:The BattlefordsEstablished:1908-04-03Province:SaskatchewanReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:8132 -
Record information – Details Additional information:PO 2282-1Sec.36, Twp.44, R.26, W3 - 1908-04-03Semi-staffStoreSW 1/4 Sec.31, Twp.44, R.25, W3Source:PSFDS03-(10620)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy C. E. O'Neil 1908-04-03 1908-06-11 Resignation W. B. F. Williams 1909-02-01 1910-06-10 Resignation Richard Walton 1910-11-05 1912-12-04 Resignation W. B. F. Williams 1913-01-07 1924-01-10 Resignation D. W. Ganton 1924-02-15 1924-11 Resignation William Baynton 1924-11-18 1926-05 Resignation Frederick William Magdalinski 1889-11 1926-05-26 1946-06-14 Resignation Herbert Royston OAS 1891-12-28 1946-10-09 1958-10-23 Death Clarence Angus McInnes 1896-08-06 1958-10-30 Acting Mrs. Agnes E. Royston * 1959-03-01 Acting Walter Gaythorpe Meakin OAS * 1959-04-23 Acting Walter Gaythorpe Meakin OAS * 1960-04-27 1976-09-03 Civil Service Commission Certificate, Retirement Arthur Schmidt 1976-09-03 1977-06-01 Promotion Mrs. Jessie Patrick 1977-05-31 1977-06-27 Acting Postmaster Mrs. Jessie Patrick 1977-06-27 1987-10-28 Retirement Karen Lane 1988-09-19 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.