Collection search - Bender
-
Record information – Brief Bender
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Qu'AppelleDate(s):Established Closing 1904-04-01 1953-06-30 Province:SaskatchewanReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:7735 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Sec.14, Twp.13, R.5, W2 - 1904-04-01Sec.7, Twp.13, R.4, W2Separate BuildingSource:PSFDS03-(9112)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Samuel Cummins 1904-04-01 1905-01-09 Dismissal, Political Partisanship F. E. Pratt 1905-06-01 1905-12-21 Resignation Robert Reid 1906-04-01 1913-12-31 Resignation Alexander Watt 1914-02-14 1919-12-01 Resignation W. G. Drake 1920-02-28 1924-06-06 Resignation Francis David Edwards OAS 1876 1924-08-11 1934-02-12 * David Clifford Owen OAS 1897-10-18 1935-08-22 1941-04-15 Resignation William Henry Pearce OAS 1891-02-14 1941-07-31 1944-07 Resignation Mrs. Elizabeth Clara Bagu * 1944-08-01 1951-06-19 * Joseph Steve Szakacs * 1951-06-21 Acting Joseph Steve Szakacs * 1951-11-02 1953-06-30 Resignation, Closed *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.