Collection search - Val Côté
-
Record information – Brief Val Côté
Hierarchical level:ItemDate(s):Established Closing 1927-08-01 1967-04-27 Reopened Closing 1967-06-01 Province:OntarioReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:6541 -
Record information – Details Additional information:HouseLot 19, Con 6, Twp DevittSource:PSFDS03-(5468)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Mrs. Helene Lachance 1872-07-10 1973-06-15 Temporarily Closed George Cote 1927-08-01 1928-08-31 Resignation Edmond Comeau * 1928-09-19 1941-03-13 Resignation Lydger Hirsce 1896-04-30 1941-04-08 Acting Lydger Hirsce 1896-04-30 1941-07-03 1959-05-08 Resignation Jerome Gerard Larochelle * 1959-05-16 Acting Jerome Gerard Larochelle * 1960-10-12 1967-06-05 Resignation Antonie Trudel * 1967-06-01 Acting Antonio Trudel * 1967-09-05 1968-06-01 Resignation Val Cote Co-operative Store 1968-07-02 Acting Val Cote Co-operative Store 1968-08-02 1972-07-09 Phillip Mercure * 1974-04-08 1977-12-07 Mrs. Yvonne Drolet 1977-12-07 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.