Collection search - Tuktoyaktuk
-
Record information – Brief Tuktoyaktuk
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Northwest TerritoriesDate(s):Established Closing 1948-09-20 1958-02-09 Reopened Closing 1958-06-19 Province:Northwest TerritoriesReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:6094 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Accounting - 1966-01-11Store owned by PMSource:PSFDS03-(14442)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Reverend Father J. L'Helgouach * 1948-09-20 1951-08-31 Resignation Reverend John Henri Franche * 1951-07-14 Acting Reverend John Henri Franche * 1951-09-19 1956-01-02 Resignation Sam Raddy * 1956-01-03 Acting Sam Raddy * 1956-02-29 1958-01-09 * Norman Graham Simpson OAS * 1958-06-19 Acting Norman Graham Simpson OAS * 1959-01-22 1968-03-01 Change of PM only William Osborne 1968-03-01 1972-12-06 Resigned David S.C. Anderson * 1972-12-07 N. Raymond 1976-02-13 1976-06-19 Resignation Mrs. V.W. Greber 1976-07-30 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.