Collection search - St. Andrews
-
Record information – Brief St. Andrews
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:SelkirkDate(s):Established Closing Prior to 1872-07-01 1936-02-29 Province:ManitobaReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:6085 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Closed owing to Rural Mail Delivery service via Winnipeg R.R. No. 1St. Andrews - 1874Source:PSFDS03-(8408)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Thomas Sinclair 1877-01-01 1883 Left the place James Stewart 1883-12-01 1885-10-30 Resignation Sam E. Smalley 1886-01-01 1886-07-23 Resignation George Kennedy 1887-01-01 1887-09-26 Resignation Percy Mathews 1887-10-01 1888-06-12 Resignation John F. Kennedy 1888-10-01 1890-08-22 Resignation David B. Anderson 1890-10-01 1891-10-12 Resignation George Davis 1892-02-01 1893-10-09 Resignation Mrs. Emma Burnell 1894-06-01 1894-08-10 Resignation D.B. Anderson 1895-07-01 1901-01-28 Resignation John Bush 1901-07-01 1902-01-20 Resignation Mrs. Agnes Anderson 1902-06-01 1904-01-13 Resignation Nathan Less 1904-08-01 1904-12-09 Resignation Henry R. Hodson 1905-05-01 1906-03-15 Resignation Mrs. Margaret Hodgson 1907-06-01 1908-12-23 Resignation Nathan Less 1909-03-01 1936-02-29 Closed (R.M.D. Winnipeg R.R. 1) Andrew Mowat P.M. in 1872 1875-06 Resignation *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.