Collection search - Havelock
-
Record information – Brief Havelock
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Fundy - Royal, RoyalProvince:New BrunswickReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:5754 -
Record information – Details Additional information:* Civil Service CommissionChange from Way Office to Regular Office - 1875-04-01Grade 3PO 2035-1Semi-StaffSource:PSFDS03-(17514)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Murray B. Keith (shown as PM) 1868 1873-05-13 Resignation Charles Israel Keith 1873-08-01 1886-03-24 Resignation Hilgard A. Keith 1886-07-01 1889-03-22 Resignation Fred Gorham 1889-10-09 1890-08 Resignation Charles I. Keith 1890-10-01 1896-11-20 * Samuel Perry 1897-01-01 1912-12-18 Dismissal, Political Partisanship J. Delbert Seely 1913-01-08 1919-11-25 Resignation Brewer W. Thorne OAS 1895-04 1920-01-08 1956-07-08 Death Mrs. Jean Elizabeth Alward * 1956-07-10 Acting Robert Arnold Steeves * 1957-02-01 Acting Robert Arnold Steeves (*) * 1958-02-01 1967-09-28 Promoted to Petitcodiac PO Mrs. Elizabeth M. Constantine (*) * 1967-09-29 1977-07-17 Retired Jennie M. Keith * 1977-07-18 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.