Collection search - Desaulniers
-
Record information – Brief Desaulniers
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:NipissingDate(s):Established Closing 1896-04-01 1960-06-30 Province:OntarioReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:5602 -
Record information – Details Additional information:BadgerowGibbon - 1896-04-01Store - generalSource:PSFDS03-(1132)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Charles Joanis 1896-04-01 1902-10-22 Resignation Martin Cousineau 1903-04-15 1911 * Alfred Quenneville 1911-05-12 1912-03-19 Resignation J. Arthur Quenneville 1912-05-03 1927-01-08 Dismissal of Postmaster (Political Partisanship) Damien Lalonde 1927-01-17 1937-09 Resignation Albemi St. Louis 1937-10-15 1947-03-06 Resignation Wilfrid Joseph Philippe O.A.S. * 1947-03-16 Acting Wilfrid Joseph Philippe O.A.S. * 1947-06-16 1951-05-10 Resignation Edmond Menard * 1951-05-15 Acting Edmond Menard * 1951-08-30 1953-05-13 Resignation Ferdinand Serre * 1953-05-16 Acting Ferdinand Serre * 1953-07-06 1960-01-12 * Miss Adrienne Serre * 1960-01-21 Acting Closed Rural Mail Delivery *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.