Collection search - Churchville
-
Record information – Brief Churchville
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:PeelDate(s):Established Closing Prior to 1840 1918-07-15 Province:OntarioReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:5528 -
Record information – Details Source:PSFDS03-(831)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy W. Law 1840-08-06 Resignation Abijah Lewis 1840-08-07 1841-07-06 Resignation D. Perry 1841-07-07 Thoman Manes 1864-10-01 1865-03 Left the place James E. Pointer 1865-06-01 1878 Left the place Thomas A. Fogarty 1879-04-01 1909-08-16 Death Charlotte Louise Fogarty 1909-09-01 1918 Closed R.M.D. William Duggan PM 1854 1863-04-29 * *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.