Collection search - Montréal-Montréal South
-
Record information – Brief Montréal-Montréal South
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:LongueuilEstablished:1892-04-01Now known as:Ville Jacques Cartier Sub no. 3 since 1956-12-02Province:QuebecReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:5407 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Location - 10 St Helene St - 352 St Helene StLocation - 1095 Washington - 1952-12-26 - 773 Ste Helene - 1955-07-27Location - 433 Ste Helene St - 437 St Helene St - 1945-07-17Location - 471 St Helene - 1951-05-09 - 473 Ste Helene St - 1951-10-10Location - 503 Ste Helene - 1955-11-03 - 1154 Ave Victoria - 1956-08-15Location - Longueuil - 1892-04-01 - 25 Victoria AveNature of premises - StoreStatus - Sub office - 1916Source:PSFDS03-(26317)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy George Snelling 1892-04-01 1895-05-17 Resignation Henri Paquette 1895-06-01 1899-12-18 Resignation Louis Sabatier 1900-02-01 1903 Death Francois X. Duguette 1903-10-01 1912-06-25 * Napoleon Labonte 1912-09-05 1918-06-14 * Alfred G. Bentley 1918-10-02 1919-07-10 Resignation John Hope 1919-12-09 1919-12-12 Resignation Henry Dew 1920-04-12 1921-10-04 Death A.G. Bentley 1922-07-26 1930-04-25 Resignation Mrs Azilda Deslisle 1930-05-26 Acting Mrs Azilda Deslisle 1930-11-08 1931-01-28 * William Victor Lyall OAS 1897-10 1931-02-04 1943-04-16 * Emile Saindon 1895-06-11 1943-12-09 1945-05-12 Resignation Bruno Camirand 1900-03-20 1945-07-17 1951-03-28 Resignation - temporarily closed - 1951-04-03 Joseph L.G. Champagne (reopened) * 1951-05-09 1951-10-04 Resignation Guy Olivier Paris * 1951-10-10 Acting Guy Olivier Paris * 1951-12-13 1982-04-23 Resignation Moise M. Parent * 1952-05-01 Acting Moise M. Parent * 1952-07-15 1952-11-20 Resignation, temporarily closed - 1952-11-21 Raymond M. Facteau (reopened) * 1952-12-26 1955-02-03 Temporarily closed - 1955-03-09 Mrs Carmelle Duguette (reopened) * 1955-07-27 Acting Mrs Carmelle Duquette * 1955-09-20 1955-10-04 Resignation Mrs Pierrette Marini * 1955-11-03 Acting Temporarily closed Jean Marie Lavoie 1956-08-15 Acting Jean Marie Lavoie 1956-10-25 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.