Collection search - Mentmore
-
Record information – Brief Mentmore
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:MarquetteDate(s):Established Closing 1927-11-01 1966-12-09 Province:ManitobaReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:4047 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Office permanently closed 1966-12-09 due to its limited usefulnessStoreSW Sec. 26, Twp. 13, R. 16, WPM - 1927-11-01Source:PSFDS03-(8035)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy (Vacancy cancelled) 1951-05-18 Resignation Edgar David Fleger 1927-11-01 1929-12-12 Resignation Percy William Drayson OAS 1930-01-08 1930-07-29 Resignation Kenneth Milton McDougall * 1930-11-14 1943-07-27 Resignation Mrs. Edith Dunsmore * 1943-08-01 Mrs. Edith Dunsmore * 1943-11-03 1945-03-05 Resignation Thomas Henry Hockin * 1945-04-15 Acting Thomas Henry Hockin * 1945-04-18 1945-08-09 Resignation Arthur Hayhoe Benge * 1945-09-30 1946-07-12 Resignation John Kristberg Johannesson * 1946-07-19 Acting John Kristberg Johannesson * 1947-01-07 1947-01-24 Resignation Gerald Ernest Reilly * 1947-02-15 Acting Gerald Ernest Reilly * 1947-05-12 1948-12-10 Resignation Conrad Gesli Anderson OAS * 1948-12-23 Acting Conrad Gesli Anderson OAS * 1949-04-01 1950-09-30 Resignation Kenneth William Henry Wahoski * 1951-04-04 Acting Kenneth William Henry Wahoski * 1951-08-09 1960-05-01 Resignation Charles Mervin Drayson * 1960-05-01 Charles Mervin Drayson * 1960-10-31 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.