Collection search - Webster's Corners
-
Record information – Brief Webster's Corners
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Fraser Valley WestEstablished:1891-10-01Province:British ColumbiaReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:3945 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Location - Lot 1, Sec. 24, Twp. 12StoreStore, grocerySource:PSFDS03-(23719)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy J. M. Webster 1891-10-01 1920-03-06 Resignation T. R. Johnston 1920-05-16 1923-05-11 Resignation Russel G. Kirkpatrick 1923-06-13 1929-07-08 Resignation Herman Wilfrid Fortin 1929-10-24 1931-10-27 Resignation Alexander John Kirkpatrick 1876-02-04 1932-02-16 1935-12-27 Resignation John Sydney Mercy OAS 1892-10-04 1936-01-01 John Sydney Mercy OAS 1892-10-04 1936-03-03 1944-03-24 Resignation, granted military leave Miss Stella Mercy * 1941-05-09 John Sidney Mercy OAS 1892-10-04 1943-04-01 Discharged and returned to duty Harold Ambrose Young 1884-01-20 1944-04-01 Acting Harold Ambrose Young 1884-01-20 1944-07-06 1945-02-15 Resignation Laurance William Jackson OAS 1898-04-14 1945-02-23 Acting Laurance William Jackson OAS 1898-04-14 1945-06-04 1948-03-09 Resignation Wilfred Kilburn OAS 1898-07-08 1948-03-16 Acting Wilfred Kilburn OAS 1898-07-08 1948-10-28 1949-08-22 Resignation Thomas Edward Robinson * 1949-09-01 Acting Thomas Edward Robinson * 1949-12-28 1951-03 Resignation Charles Henry Bradley * 1951-03-31 Acting Charles Henry Bradley * 1951-07-19 1955-07-19 Resignation Mrs. Mary Amelia Melhuish OAS * 1955-07-31 Acting Mrs. Mary Amelia Melhuish OAS * 1955-11-04 1956-03-24 Resignation Donald Alexander Bulloch OAS * 1956-03-25 Acting Donald Alexander Bulloch OAS * 1956-07-12 1960-01-20 Resignation Mrs. Freda Loretta Bateman * 1960-02-01 Acting Mr. John Schneider OAS * 1960-04-21 Acting Mr. John Schneider OAS * 1960-06-08 1961-09-30 Resignation Mrs. Mina Schneider * 1961-10-05 Acting Mrs. Mina Schneider * 1962-05-09 1962-08-16 Resignation Mrs. Claire Lacroix * 1962-08-21 Acting Mrs. Claire Lacroix * 1962-09-25 1968-05-07 Resignation Thomas H. Laity * 1968-06-01 Acting *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.