Collection search - Cross Lake
-
Record information – Brief Cross Lake
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:ChurchillEstablished:1921-07-01Province:ManitobaReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:3924 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Accounting - 1967-06-01Hudson's Bay Company StoreS, Twp. 65, R. 3, WPM - 1921-07-01Source:PSFDS03-(7833)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Lorna F. McIvor * 1976-08-31 Charles H. M. Gordon 1921-07-01 1923-08-31 Resignation A. W. Anderson 1895-06-17 1924-01-15 1926-08-10 Resignation Alexander Mackintosh 1886-08-29 1926-12-29 1931-06-20 Resignation John Denton 1889-11-28 1931-08-01 1940-01 Resignation Alexander Mackie Chalmers OAS 1892-03-21 1940-02-02 Acting Alexander Mackie chalmers OAS 1892-03-21 1940-04-30 1948-10-14 Resignation Hugh Woodroffe Sutherland OAS * 1949-01-14 Acting Hugh Woodroffe Sutherland OAS * 1949-03-23 1950-11-24 Resignation Richard Routledge Smith OAS * 1951-01-26 1953-01-19 Resignation John Derek Riley 1953-04-01 Acting John Derek Riley * 1953-06-22 1955-06-20 Resignation Norman Graham Simpson * 1955-07-04 Acting Norman Graham Simpson * 1955-08-18 1968-03-01 Change in P.M. Only Wulfert A. Tolboom 1968-03-01 1971-12-07 Resignation Angus T. McIvor * 1971-12-08 1972-08-10 Cross Lake Com. Council 1972-08-11 1974-05-01 Angus T. McIvor * 1974-05-01 1976-07-20 Sandra De Laronde * 1976-09-01 1977-03-31 Lorna McIvor * 1977-04-01 1979-06-06 Resigned Jacqueline McIvor 1979-06-07 Kathleen J. Ross 1982-07-05 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.