Collection search - Greenlay
-
Record information – Brief Greenlay
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:RichmondDate(s):Established Closing 1903-08-01 1973-10-09 Province:QuebecReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:3460 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Adresse - rue PrincipaleBureau comptable, grade 11Source:PSFDS03-(26200)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Mrs. Orise Bolduc 1945-01-29 Resignation George Morin 1903-08-01 1906-11-03 Resignation Albert W. Sykes 1906-12-01 1910-03-09 Resignation E. J. Morrissette 1910-06-01 1914-07-15 Resignation J. P. Salois 1914-08-06 1923-11-07 Resignation Mrs. Amanda Gauthier 1924-02-05 1928-04-27 Resignation Jos. Emery Nault 1928-07-03 1934-07 Death Mrs. Orise Morissette Nault 1934-08-17 1943-05-20 Resignation Mrs. Corinne Omer St-Onge * 1945-04-30 Acting Mrs. Corinne Omer St-Onge * 1945-06-11 1948-04-26 Resignation Gerard Lussier * 1948-12-01 1951-10-10 Resignation Armand Simoneau * 1951-12-01 Acting Armand Simoneau * 1951-12-13 1973-10-09 Office changed to Windsor city D'ly *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.