Collection search - Beauval
-
Record information – Brief Beauval
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Meadow LakeEstablished:1910-05-01Province:SaskatchewanReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:3308 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Mail service twice a month onlyS0M 0G0Sec.15, Twp.71, R.11, W3Twp.54, R.11, W3Twp.71, R.11, W3Twp.71, R.11, W3Unsurveyed - 1910-05-01Source:PSFDS03-(9083)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy R. F. Millard (Hudson's Bay Co.) 1974-01-09 Resignation Philip J. Gauthier 1975-05-26 Resignation Alex Laliberte * Reverend Father Oncel 1910-05-01 1919-03-10 Resignation Reverend Martin Lajeunesse 1919-06-06 1927-06-03 Resignation Reverend Louis Mederic Adam 1928-01-01 1929-01-17 Resignation Mrs. Ada Dupuis 1929-08-19 1931-12-31 Resignation Mrs. Violet Day * 1932-04-09 1932-06-22 Resignation Joseph Francis Dupuis 1876-08-02 1932-11-30 1938-05-05 Declared Vacant Mrs. Constance Gertrude Marion * 1938-03-31 Acting Peder Andrew Pederson 1901-10-10 1938-09-15 Acting Francois Laliberte 1888-03-19 1939-04-22 1941-06-26 Resignation David Robertson OAS 1896-03-23 1942-05-07 1943-10-25 Resignation Willy Hugo Sandherr * 1944-01-23 Acting Willy Hugo Sandherr * 1944-04-25 1957-09-27 * Norman G. Simpson * 1957-10-11 Acting Norman Graham Simpson OAS * 1959-01-13 1968-03-01 Change in P.M. only Wulfert A. Tolboom 1968-03-01 Joseph P. Gauthier 1974-01-09 Jules Roy 1975-05-27 1975-07-16 Norman Bonneau 1975-07-16 Norman Bonneau 1975-07-28 1975-10-07 Resignation Dave Lorne Roy 1975-10-08 Dave Lorne Roy 1975-12-12 1976-09-01 Resignation Jules Roy 1976-09-01 1977-02-26 * Philip Gauthier 1977-02-26 Mrs. Theresa M. Gauthier 1977-06-15 1978-08-12 Resignation Miss Sharon C. Durocher 1978-10-16 1979-06-27 Resignation Mrs. Linda M. Campbell 1979-06-27 Temporary Miss Simonne Laliberte 1979-10-05 1980-08-29 Resignation Louise Laliberte 1980-08-30 Temporary Myrna J. Bouvier 1980-12-22 1983-12-16 Resignation Mrs. Janice Laliberte 1984-01-10 1986-09-13 Resignation Dorothy Dorocker 1986-09-15 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.