Collection search - Head of Indian Harbour Lake
-
Record information – Brief Head of Indian Harbour Lake
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:GuysboroughEstablished:1879-06-01Now known as:Indian Harbor Lake since 1901-11-01Province:Nova ScotiaReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:26388 -
Record information – Details Source:PSFDS03-(20063)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy John Furlong 1879-06-01 1880-04-02 Resignation John Hullett 1881-05-01 1887 Change of site John Lyons 1888-02-01 1890-06-20 Resignation John W. Worth 1890-06-01 1895-04-10 Resignation David Rood 1895-11-01 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.