Collection search - Church Over
-
Record information – Brief Church Over
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Queens-Shelburne, Shelburne - Yarmouth - ClareDate(s):Established Closing 1881-02-01 1962-09-05 Province:Nova ScotiaReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:25909 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Mail route - Church Over and Birchtown Railway StationSource:PSFDS03-(19429)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Joseph Walters 1881-02-01 1886-10-12 Resignation Miss Maria Ballard 1887-01-01 1897-09-22 Change of location Saml D. Rudolph 1898-01-01 1909-10-23 Resignation Albert Mahaney 1911-01-07 1912-12-04 Resignation Maurice G. Acker 1913-01-01 1915-04-15 Resignation Mrs. Bessie Acker 1889-10 1915-05-15 1960-02-15 * Mrs. Hilje [Hilye] Acker * 1960-02-26 1962-07-03 Resignation, closed for want of a PM *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.