Collection search - Hillcrest
-
Record information – Brief Hillcrest
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:YukonDate(s):Established Closing 1954-08-09 1968-07-31 Province:Yukon TerritoryReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:23387 -
Record information – Details Additional information:* Civil Service Commission3.5 miles SW of Whitehorse on the Alaska Highway - 1954-08-02Closed to Whitehorse - 1968-07-31Group 22 - 1965-10-01PO 2394-1Separate building supplied by RCAFSup. PM - WhitehorseSource:PSFDS03-(14897)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy John Thevan Davey OAS * 1954-08-09 1954-08-26 Trans. to Crescent Beach John Esmond Moran * 1954-08-27 Acting John Esmond Moran (*) * 1955-09-01 1960-02-21 Death Mrs. Hilda Yendall * 1960-02-22 Acting Mrs. Eileen Lena Brezinski * 1961-01-03 Acting Mrs. Eileen Lena Brezinski (*) * 1962-01-05 1962-03-26 Resignation Mrs. Irene Conners * 1962-07-23 Acting Mrs. Irene Conners (*) * 1962-10-31 1964-03-28 Resignation Arnold Newman 1964-06-27 Acting Mrs. Mary Edna Harvey (*) * 1964-07-10 1965-06-16 Resignation Mrs. Theda Agnes Smigarowski * 1965-10-01 Acting Mrs. Theda Agnes Smigarowski (*) * 1965-11-19 1967-04-29 Mrs. Vera Gladys Lemaire * 1967-04-30 1968-06-06 Resignation *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.