Collection search - Stouffville
-
Record information – Brief Stouffville
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:North YorkDate(s):Established Closing 1841-07-06 Reopened Closing Prior to 1832 1839 Province:OntarioReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:21291 -
Record information – Details Additional information:PO 1434-1Semi-staff Group 33 - 1948-04-01StaffWhitechurch - 1832Source:PSFDS03-(12036)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Mr. W. MacDougall 1974-03-29 John Boyer 1841-07-06 A. C. Lloyd 1852 Samuel Fenton 1856-10-01 1861-01-11 * John White 1861-05-01 1864-10 * Edward Wheler 1865-01-01 1878-06-27 Resignation William B. Sanders 1878-08-02 1912-06-10 Dismissal, Political Partisanship Joseph A. Todd 1912-06-13 1913-11-13 Death James J. Rae 1914-01-02 1926-06-18 * Eugene Blair Leavens OAS 1894-07-27 1927-02-01 1954-07-26 Retirement John Stratton Sanders OAS * 1954-07-26 Acting John Stratton Sanders OAS * 1955-08-01 1973-10-01 Mr. G. A. Collins 1974-03-29 C. D. Sheldon PM in 1832 W. H. Doyle PM in 1835 1839 Closed Edward Wheler PM in 1854 1856-07-24 Resignation *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.