Collection search - Pasqua
-
Record information – Brief Pasqua
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Moose Jaw - Lake CentreDate(s):Established Closing 1883-11-01 1969-12-31 Province:SaskatchewanReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:20184 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Sec.2, Twp.17, R.25, W2 - 1883-11-01Sec.28, Twp.16, R.25, W2Source:PSFDS03-(10732)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy J. W. Broodfield 1883-11-01 1886-08-12 Resignation Hugh H. Rorison 1887-04-01 1888-06-18 Resignation Joseph Hughes 1888-11-01 1893-09-07 Resignation D. Dunston 1894-01-01 1902-12-11 Change of Site John Slemmon 1903-02-01 1910 Resignation James Duncan 1910-05-11 1912-08-29 Resignation A. Yokum 1913-02-04 1914-02-03 Resignation W. H. Ratee 1914-02-28 1915-03-08 Resignation John Kerr 1915-05-08 1920 Resignation Frank E. Talbot OAS 1920-12-31 1927-10-22 Resignation James Percy Duncan * 1928-12-03 1937-06-30 Resignation James Duncan Sr. 1878-11-18 1937-06-30 James Duncan Sr. 1878-11-18 1937-09-17 1951-11-01 Resignation William Joseph Best OAS 1897-03-14 1951-12-01 Acting William Joseph Best OAS 1897-03-14 1952-02-22 1954-01-29 Resignation Mrs. Aurora Hochban * 1954-02-01 Acting Mrs. Aurora Hochban * 1954-02-22 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.