Collection search - Driftpile
-
Record information – Brief Driftpile
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Peace RiverDate(s):Established Closing 1919-05-15 1921-05-16 Reopened Closing 1926-05-01 1958-05-31 1960-03-16 Province:AlbertaReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:19855 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Distance to nearest offices - Faust - 4 miles, Enilda - 24 milesDistributing point - DriftpileGeneral Store owned by PM's husband owner - 1953-03-29Indian Reserve 150, SW Sec. 22, Twp. 73, R. 12, W5M - 1929-02-15Mail route - Driftpile-Railway StationNE Sec. 22, Twp. 73, R. 12, W5M - 1926-05-01NW Sec. 22, Twp. 73, R. 12, W5M - 1932-09-01Store owned by PM - 1952-08-21Store rented by PM - 1954-01-22SW 1/4 Sec. 22, Twp. 73, R. 12, W5MSW Sec. 22, Twp. 73, R. 12, W5M - 1933-10-24Source:PSFDS03-(12793)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy William Ashley 1919-05-15 1921-05-16 Resignation, closed Mrs. Madeline Plaise (re-opened) 1926-05-01 1929-05-11 * Kenneth Bown Thomson 1929-05-11 1932-07-07 Resignation Wm. Alfred Foister OAS 1882-01-19 1932-09-01 1933-10-24 Death Maurice Benson Windsor 1900-07-15 1934-05-16 1943-06-29 Resignation Mrs. Lena Pickford 1901-12-24 1943-08-02 1952-08-20 Resignation Mrs. Gertrude Lee * 1952-08-21 Acting Mrs. Gertrude Lee * 1952-12-08 1953-03-21 Resignation Mrs. Eli Cecelia Anderson * 1953-03-29 Acting Mrs. Eli Cecelia Anderson * 1953-06-30 1953-08-13 Resignation Ernest McGillivray OAS * 1954-01-22 Acting Ernest McGillivray OAS * 1954-05-28 1958-04-25 Resignation Mrs. Ella C. Anderson * 1958-05-03 Acting Temp. closed - 1958-05-31 Earl W. Anderson * 1960-03-16 1961-05-04 Resignation Mrs. Bernice Isobel Gibson * 1961-05-16 Acting Mrs. Bernice Isobel Gibson * 1961-08-18 1969-08-05 Resignation Lawrence Mathews * 1969-08-06 Acting Lawrence Mathews * 1969-09-30 1972-10-31 Resignation Margaret A. Braun 1972-11-01 1973-12-01 Resignation Mr. A. Braun 1973-12-02 1974-03-12 Transferred Miss D. Chalifoux 1974-03-13 1974-07-03 Resignation Driftpile Band 1975-02-18 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.