Collection search - Haynes
-
Record information – Brief Haynes
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Red DeerDate(s):Established Closing 1900-10-01 1908-01-01 Reopened Closing 1908-05-01 1964-06-30 Province:AlbertaReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:19770 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Mail route - Clive R.R. No. 1No change in siteSE Sec. 4, Twp. 39, R. 24, W4M - 1926-01-11, 1927-03-31, 1929-03-08Sec. 28, Twp. 39, R. 24, W4M - 1900-10-01Sec. 3, Twp. 39, R. 24, W4MSec. 8, Twp. 39, R. 24, W4M - 1908-05-01SW 1/4 Sec. 4, Twp. 39, R. 24, W4MSource:PSFDS03-(13294)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy William J. Morrical 1900-10-01 1903-08-26 Resignation Edward Le Roy Reynolds 1903-12-01 1905-02-21 Resignation W.B. Gilbert 1905-09-01 1908 Closed G.N. Clark (re-opened) 1908-05-01 1911-01-02 Resignation A. Curry 1911-03-16 1913-04-16 Resignation Mrs. E.M. Rusk 1914-04-13 1919 * Mrs. E.M. Sage (same, re-app.) 1919-03-03 1927-03-07 Resignation George Ralston 1927-03-31 George Ralston 1927-07-13 1928-10 Resignation Glen Malbie Warren 1929-03-08 1931-07-20 Resignation George Ralston 1931-08-19 1931-11-12 Resignation Mrs. Ida Bainhill Fawcett 1932-06-08 Temporary Mrs. Ida Bainhill Fawcett 1932-10-01 1938-08-16 Resignation Miss I.M. Stevens 1938-08-29 Temporary Mrs. Cecilia Ruebina Norguay 1895-02-14 1938-09-15 1964-06-30 * *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.