Collection search - St. Jean de Matha
-
Record information – Brief St. Jean de Matha
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:BerthierEstablished:1858-07-01Province:QuebecReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:19145 -
Record information – Details Source:PSFDS03-(29585)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Francois X. Lasalle 1858-07-01 1878 Resignation J.R. Libbe 1878-04-01 1896-09-20 Death Mrs H. Lebbe 1897-02-01 1901-11-07 Change of site J.B. Turcotte 1901-12-01 1911-12-13 Resignation J. Origene Lavalle 1912-02-01 1923-11-03 Dismissal, political partisanship Amedee Dugas 1923-12-21 Acting Amedee Dugas 1924-03-18 1933-11-02 * Leopold Marcil 1898-10-15 1933-11-15 Acting Leopold Marcil 1898-10-15 1933-11-29 1944-05-28 Death Mrs Marie Pelland Marcil 1898-07-05 1944-05-29 Acting Mrs Marie Pelland Marcil 1898-07-05 1946-07-05 1956-05-16 Resignation Joseph Comtois * 1956-09-04 1965-01-06 Death Mrs Louisette Genereux * 1965-01-07 Acting Mrs Louisette Gerereux * 1965-03-04 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.