Collection search - Prévost
-
Record information – Brief Prévost
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:TerrebonneDate(s):Established Closing 1923-07-09 1947-10-02 Reopened Closing 1948-06-15 1964-09-15 Province:QuebecReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:1909 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Location - St. Sauveur des Monts - 1923-07-09Post office permanently closed 1964-09-15 owing to its limited usefulness.Source:PSFDS03-(28103)Summer-winter:1959-06-15 - 1959-09-151960-06-15 - 1960-09-151961-06-15 - 1961-09-151962-06-15 - 1962-09-151963-06-15Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Hormidas Morin 1923-07-09 1947-03-14 Resignation Rene Cyr * 1947-05-27 1947-09-04 Resignation William Hammerman 1898-02-14 1948-06-15 1964-09-15 Permanently closed *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.