Collection search - Chûte des Passes
-
Record information – Brief Chûte des Passes
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:LapointeDate(s):Established Closing 1960-08-09 1974-08-29 Province:QuebecReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:18878 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Location - Les Magasins LavalNature of premises - General store - store (Les Magasins Laval) - General managerSource:PSFDS03-(25820)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Paul Henri Roy * 1960-08-09 Acting Paul Henri Roy * 1960-09-26 1962-07-12 Resignation Guy Boivin * 1962-07-13 Acting Jean Guy Desjardins * 1962-10-25 1963-06-20 Transferred Clement Gagnon * 1963-07-09 Acting Clement Gagnon * 1963-08-07 1966-09-19 Resignation Andre Harvey * 1966-09-20 Acting Benoit Lambert * 1967-01-04 Acting Benoit Lambert * 1967-01-12 Resignation Marie-Joseph Maltais * 1970-04-14 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.