Collection search - Beaubier
-
Record information – Brief Beaubier
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:AssiniboiaEstablished:1927-08-01Province:SaskatchewanReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:18528 -
Record information – Details Additional information:NE Sec.16, Twp.2, R.16, W2StoreSource:PSFDS03-(9080)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy John Kinna OAS 1927-08-01 1929-02-19 Resignation Frank J. Smith 1929-12-16 1940-03-06 Death Mrs. Edna Irene Smith 1940-03-09 Acting Mrs. Edna Irene Smith 1890-06-11 1940-09-27 1943-05-14 Resignation Clarence Selmer Pederson 1899-12-26 1943-06-09 Acting Clarence Selmer Pederson 1899-12-26 1943-09-11 1947-08-07 Resignation Mrs. Myrtle Madaline McAdam * 1947-08-16 Acting Mrs. Myrtle Madaline McAdam * 1947-12-10 1954-03-08 Resignation Gordon L. Olson NIL * 1954-04-01 Acting Gordon L. Olson NIL * 1954-04-22 1959-01-30 Resignation Mrs. Hjordis Constance Olson * 1959-02-08 Acting (Postmaster General) Mrs. Hjordis Constance Olson * 1959-06-24 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.