Collection search - Eversley
-
Record information – Brief Eversley
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:YorkDate(s):Established Closing 1865-05-01 1928-01-31 Province:OntarioReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:17991 -
Record information – Details Additional information:King - 1865-05-01Source:PSFDS03-(1422)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy James Tinline 1865-05-01 1875-11-15 Resignation Henry Rogers 1876-01-01 1879-10-21 Resignation Francis Stiver 1880-01-01 1882-01-31 Resignation William Fisher 1883-01-01 1883-04-17 Resignation John McMullen 1883-10-01 1887-09-17 Resignation W.H. Roberts 1887-10-01 1888-11-01 Resignation George F. Lee 1889-01-01 1890-07-06 Resignation Thomas A. Howard 1890 1891-01-25 Resignation Hugh Mitchell 1891-03-01 1891-09-02 Resignation Henry Rogers 1891-12-01 1897 Death Robert Gallatly 1897-06-01 1928 Closed R.M.D. - King RR #3 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.