Collection search - Wanless
-
Record information – Brief Wanless
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:ChurchillDate(s):Established Closing 1937-02-08 1954-04-30 Reopened Closing 1955-01-03 Province:ManitobaReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:17691 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Corner of Lot 21, Plan 625, Twp. 60, R. 27, WPM - 1955-01-03GRP 01 - 1966-09-01GRP 01 - 1973-10-01GRP 02 - 1960-08-01GRP 02 - 1970-04-01GRP 02 - 1977-10-01GRP 02 - 1981-03-01GRP 04 - 1957-05-01NE 1/4 Sec. 12, Twp. 60, R. 27, WPM - 1953-10-01SE 1/4 Sec. 13, Twp. 60, R. 27, WPM - 1956-09-19Store building set aside owned by P.M. - 1953-10-01Store building set aside owned by P.M. - 1955-01-03Source:PSFDS03-(8519)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy William Henry Beasley 1937-02-08 1948-10-25 Resignation Frank Glover OAS 1888-08-07 1948-11-01 Acting Frank Glover OAS 1888-08-07 1949-02-05 1953-08-31 Resignation John Edison McCullough * 1953-10-01 Acting John Edison McCullough * 1953-10-19 1954-01-25 Resignation Mrs. Elsie Kathleen Molyneaux * 1955-01-03 Acting Mrs. Elsie Kathleen Molyneaux * 1955-10-12 1974-04-10 Retirement William John Jacobsen * 1974-04-11 1975-04-11 Resignation Mrs. Lena T. Pfund * 1975-04-12 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.