Collection search - Holyoke
-
Record information – Brief Holyoke
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:AthabaskaDate(s):Established Closing 1931-04-01 1958-08-06 Province:AlbertaReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:16978 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Dwelling owned by PM - 1954-04-01Mail route - E.P. & Ed.NE Sec. 36, Twp. 59, R. 5, W4M - 1956-06-01NW Sec. 19, Twp. 59, R. 4, W4MSE 1/4 Sec. 36, Twp. 59, R. 5, W4M - 1954-04-01SE Sec. 25, Twp. 59, R. 5, W4MStoreSource:PSFDS03-(13360)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Joseph Alfred Bergeron 1888-01 1931-04-01 1943-10-28 Resignation Mrs. Bernadette Lord 1898-08-07 1943-11-15 Acting Eugene Lord 1891-11-30 1943-12-29 1954-03-31 Resignation Emery Brunet * 1954-04-01 Acting Emery Brunet * 1954-05-11 1956-05-15 Resignation Gerard Lemieux * 1956-06-01 Acting Gerard Lemieux * 1956-06-28 1958-08-06 Closed *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.