Collection search - Southend
-
Record information – Brief Southend
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:MackenzieEstablished:1949-10-01Province:SaskatchewanReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:16839 -
Record information – Details Additional information:56 Deg. 59 Min. North Lat., 103 Deg. 13 Min. West Long.Fur Trade ControllerGroup 2Hudson's Bay Co.StoreSource:PSFDS03-(11792)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Hudson's Bay Co. - G. U. Eggertson Hudson's Bay Co. - E. P. Lacroix Hudson's Bay Co. - B. G. Watson Hugh Woodroffe Sutherland * 1949-10-01 1950-11-24 Resignation Richard Routledge Smith OAS * 1951-01-01 Acting Richard Routledge Smith OAS * 1951-01-12 1953-01-09 Resignation John Derek Riley OAS * 1953-01-09 Acting John Derek Riley OAS * 1953-06-12 1955-05-25 Resignation Norman Graham Simpson OAS * 1955-05-01 Acting Norman Graham Simpson OAS * 1955-09-07 1968-03-01 Change in Postmaster in only Hudson's Bay Co. - Wulfert A. Tolboom 1968-03-01 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.