Collection search - St. Norbert Berthier
-
Record information – Brief St. Norbert Berthier
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Berthier Maskinonge DelanaudiereEstablished:1853-06-01Province:QuebecReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:16685 -
Record information – Details Source:PSFDS03-(30108)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy L.A. DeRome (Shown as PM in 1854) T.E. Dagenais 1853-06-01 E. Grandpre 1855 1856-10-21 Resignation J.B. Denis 1857-01-01 1858-09-03 Resignation Jules Hughenon 1862-04-01 1865-05-24 Resignation N. Roch 1865-08-01 1880 Death Mrs E.P. Roch 1880-04-01 1888-08-29 Resignation Mrs Simon Carpentier 1888-11-01 1910 Death Rodrigue Ducharme 1910-10-12 1911-10-07 Resignation J. Ovide Laporte 1911-10-24 1931-12-04 Dismissal O in C political partisanship Emile Laporte 1932-02-27 1934-07-15 Death Mrs Regina Laporte 1934-08-09 1950-08-26 Resignation Mrs Madeleine Laporte Morin * 1950-08-27 Acting Mrs Madeleine Laporte Morin * 1950-09-18 1984-08-27 Retraite Mrs Madeleine Laporte Morin 1921-08-13 * 1984-08-27 Retraite Manon Durand 1984-08-28 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.