Collection search - Glenella
-
Record information – Brief Glenella
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:DauphinEstablished:1898-09-01Province:ManitobaReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:16493 -
Record information – Details Additional information:1964-10-01 GRP 231966-11-24 GRP 211967-07-01 GRP 201968-09-01 GRP 201969-04-01 GRP 121970-10-01 GRP 121974-03-01 GRP 011974-09-01 GRP 011979-03-01 GRP 01Glencairn - 8 1/2 milesLots 8 and 9, Blk. 2, Plan 331 - 1925-02-01Sec. 21, Twp. 18, R.13 W1 - 1898-09-01Tenby - 4 milesSource:PSFDS03-(7737)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Hugh N. Ray 1898-09-01 1920-06-29 Resignation John Neville OAS 1920-10-16 1925 * Walter Addis 1888-02-24 1925-02-01 1953-02-24 Retired Armer Howard Girling * 1953-02-25 Acting Armer Howard Girling * 1954-02-25 1966-12-27 Transferred as PM at Oak Lake Michael Marciski OAS * 1966-12-28 Acting Michael Marciski * 1967-01-30 1984-12-02 Irene Miller 1984-12-03 1985-08-19 Anne Ott 1985-08-19 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.