Collection search - Altamont
-
Record information – Brief Altamont
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:LisgarEstablished:1884-09-01Province:ManitobaReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:16161 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Sec. 21, Twp. 5, R. 8, W - 1916-03-20Sec. 21, Twp. 5, R. 8, W - 1955-03-26Sec. 21, Twp. 5, R. 8, W - 1972-08-01Sec. 21, Twp. 5, R. 8, W - 1979-12-06Sec. 21, Twp. 5, R. 8, W1 - 1884-09-01Source:PSFDS03-(7486)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Hy Mussell 1884-09-01 1920-01-07 Resignation Stephen Henry Bishop * 1920-03-16 1955-03-25 Resignation Robert Benjamin Marshall OAS * 1955-04-01 Acting Robert Benjamin Marshall OAS * 1955-05-05 1972-07-31 Resignation Mrs. Margarat L. Holliston * 1972-08-01 1979-12-05 Resignation George W. Haines * 1979-12-06 1984-02-05 Mrs. Ruth E. Haines 1984-04-01 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.