Collection search - Duart
-
Record information – Brief Duart
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:KentEstablished:1857-08-01Province:OntarioReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:15347 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Group 3 - 1978-04-01Orford - 1857-08-01RevenueStoreSup PM RidgetownSource:PSFDS03-(6458)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy James Tait, Sr. 1857-08-01 1882 Left the place W.M. Curtis 1884-05-06 1887-02-24 Resignation Samuel Walker 1887-05-10 1890-09-10 Resignation Charles Elford 1891-05-01 1894-08 Death Mrs. Jennie H. Tait 1894-10-30 1899-06-01 Resignation Robert Currie 1866-04 1899-11-06 1941-07-05 * Mrs. Annie O'Neill 1884-09-12 1941-10-23 1948-07-24 Resignation Morley Groves Moore * 1948-08-23 Acting Morley Groves Moore * 1948-12-22 1960-02-18 Resignation Ernest Alexander Kerr * 1960-04-01 Acting Ernest Alexander Kerr * 1960-04-12 Mrs. I. Joy Kerr 1984-12-25 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.