Collection search - Hannon
-
Record information – Brief Hannon
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:WentworthEstablished:1854-03-01Province:OntarioReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:15304 -
Record information – Details Additional information:BartonGlanford - 1854-03-01PO 2158-1Semi Staff - 1957-07-01StoreSource:PSFDS03-(6210)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Joseph Hannon 1854-03-01 1868-06-17 Resignation Thomas Cowie 1868-10-01 1878 Death Mrs. Thomas Cowie 1879-04-01 1887-07-05 Resignation James Theobold 1887-10-01 1896-02-04 Resignation Thomas E. Tidey 1896-04-01 1898-03-29 Resignation Charles E. Horning 1898-06-01 1899-03-29 Resignation Thomas E. Tidey 1899-06-01 1914-12-15 Resignation Thomas S. Fletcher 1915-01-25 1916-11-09 Resignation Edgar H. Soules 1916-11-01 1944-10-10 Resignation George Edward Reeves 1887-01-30 1944-10-31 Acting George Edward Reeves 1887-01-30 1945-01-24 1947-03-20 Resignation Mrs. Amy Victoria Irwin * 1947-05-07 1951-05-21 Resignation Thomas Greensmith Starr O.A.S. * 1951-06-01 Acting Thomas Greensmith Starr O.A.S. * 1951-09-05 1953-05-25 Death Mrs. Sheila Margaret Starr * 1953-06-01 Acting Mrs. Sheila Margaret Starr (Re-married "White") * 1955-07-01 1975-10-30 James Croucher 1975-10-31 1979-02-02 Mrs. Linda L. Barker 1979-02-03 Acting *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.