Collection search - Mistassini
-
Record information – Brief Mistassini
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:RobervalEstablished:1893-04-01Province:QuebecReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:15296 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Location - Parent Pelletier - 1893-04-01PO 1185-1Semi staffStatus - Grade 6Source:PSFDS03-(27971)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Revd. L. de Gonzague 1893-04-01 1894 Resignation Revd. F. d'Assise 1894-12-01 1897-02-06 Resignation Revd. Father Jean de Dieu 1897-03-01 1906-03-06 Death Rev. Father M. Pacome 1906-07-16 1915 Non-residence of PM Mrs. Jos. Tremblay 1915-10-15 1919-01-23 Change of site Mrs. Marie Anne Lemieux 1919-02-13 1921-12-03 * Mrs. Marie Anne Bouliane 1921-12-04 1927-04-28 Resignation (allowed to retain PMship) Geo. Henri Rodrigue 1927-12-19 1928-01-12 Resignation Philippe Mercier 1928-08-13 1930-01-22 * Antonio Hebert 1898-05-18 1930-01-18 Acting Antonio Hebert 1898-05-18 1930-10-18 1960-06-23 Death Andre Hebert * 1960-06-23 Acting Andre Hebert * 1961-05-01 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.