Collection search - Selkirk
-
Record information – Brief Selkirk
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Brant - HaldimandEstablished:1831-04-06Province:OntarioReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:15180 -
Record information – Details Additional information:PO 2205-1Semi StaffWalpole - 1838Source:PSFDS03-(6287)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy J. Cooper 1838 * William Mudie 1838-08-06 Henry Kent 1855-12-29 1866-05-04 Resignation J.A. Holmes 1866-04-01 1866-12-17 Resignation James Wilkie 1867-01-01 1870-10-14 Resignation Robert J. Winyard 1870-10-01 1910-01-06 Death Harry Kerr 1910-02-01 1913-03-03 Resignation W.H. Abrahart 1913-03-31 1924-05-05 Resignation Howard Hoover O.A.S. 1924-08-07 1929-01-30 * Harold Everett Hall O.A.S. 1929-05-22 1934-10-11 Resignation Samuel Thompson Quee O.A.S. 1934-11-15 1938-06-29 * Mrs. Violet Remus 1939-02-27 Acting Miss Bertha Mary Blanchard 1940-06-03 Acting William Mowat O.A.S. 1896-09-28 1941-05-21 1965-09-28 Retirement Clarence Melvin Mehlenbacker O.A.S. * 1965-11-02 Mrs. Judith Horvat 1984-04-09 Temporary Mrs. Doris Fess 1984-10-04 W. Baker PM in 1844 Howard Wiseman PM in 1853 1855-09-28 Resignation *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.