Collection search - London Sub #14
-
Record information – Brief London Sub #14
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Middlesex EastDate(s):Established Closing 1896-01-01 1896-05-10 Reopened Closing 1903-06-01 1942-11-07 1942-12-19 1970-11-16 Province:OntarioReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:14126 -
Record information – Details Additional information:36.00 - 1957-10-0142.00 - 1957-05-0151.00 - 1952-10-0160.00 - 1953-04-0178.00 - 1956-08-0187.00 - 1956-05-0190.00 - 1954-02-0190.00 - 1955-12-0199.00 - 1956-11-01105.00 - 1957-05-01138.00 - 1955-01-01153.00 - 1955-04-01$198.00 - 1952-04-01241 High St., N6C 3Z0 - 1955-06-07295 Ridout St., S. - 1945-12-28325 Wortley Rd. - 1942-12-19344 Ridout St., S.344 Ridout St., S. - 1950-06-19344 Ridout St., S. - 1954-08-29348 Ridout St., S. - 1952-09-01390 Springbank Dr., London, N6J 1G0 - 1978-04-04Ends 1959-07-31General Delivery Allowance:Store rented by PM - 1954-07-29Sub Office - 1919-11-01Westminster - 1896-01-01Westminster - 1903-06-01Source:PSFDS03-(5936)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy L. Bestward 1970-11-16 Temporarily Closed W.J. Braithwaite 1896-01-01 1896-04-10 Resignation - Closed James Jupp 1903-06-01 1936-05-23 Death Mrs. Helen Pugsley 1888-07-18 1936-08-24 1940-09-04 Death Miss Irene Waddell Cowan * 1940-09-04 Acting Miss Irene Waddell Cowan * 1940-10-30 1942-02-15 Resignation Mrs. Freade Mary Donaldson * 1942-04-20 Acting William Norman Floyd 1888-09-05 1942-12-19 1945-11-05 Resignation Mrs. Etta Clarice Jolliffe 1897-06-08 1945-12-28 1946-11-30 Resignation Charles Ernest Knowles O.A.S. * 1947-01-07 Acting Charles Ernest Knowles O.A.S. * 1947-02-05 1950-04-14 Resignation John Alan McCallum O.A.S. * 1950-04-27 Acting Mrs. Mary Kathleen Stephenson * 1950-06-19 Acting Mrs. Mary Kathleen Stephenson * 1951-08-17 Acting Earl Charles Sangster * 1951-08-17 1954-07-20 Resignation Earl Charles Sangster * 1951-08-17 Acting Howard Frederick Throop * 1954-07-29 Acting Howard Frederick Throop * 1954-10-08 1955-06-01 Resignation Bruce Wesley Dell * 1955-06-07 Acting Bruce Wesley Dell * 1955-06-27 1963-02-01 Resignation William E. Hamilton * 1963-02-01 Acting William Everett Hamilton * 1963-03-08 1965-02-03 Resignation Caincross & Lawrence Ltd. 1965-06-16 Change of owners G. Tamblyn Ltd. 1967-11-07 L. Bestward 1976-08-09 1976-11-10 Resignation Big V. Pharmacies 1978-04-04 1982-08-31 Springbank Crown Variety 1982-11-22 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.