Collection search - Bernières
-
Record information – Brief Bernières
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:LeoisEstablished:1882-04-01Province:QuebecReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:14008 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Location - St. Nicholas - 1882-04-01Source:PSFDS03-(24550)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Nazaire Frechette 1882-04-01 1891-06 Resignation Antoine Fortier 1891-11-01 1898-11-26 Removal of Post office Mrs Napoleon A.D. Olivier 1899-01-01 1913-03-20 Removal of Post office Nazaire Olivier 1913-04-04 1921-03-12 * Edmond Desrochers 1921-05-11 1925-02-19 Resignation Albert Dion 1895-04-07 1925-03-10 1931-08-31 Dismissal, political partisanship Alphonse Desrochers 1881-09-01 1931-09-11 1937-01-13 * Albert Dion 1895-04-07 1937-02-18 1957-06-08 Resignation Mrs Yvonne H. Dion 1896-01-22 1957-06-15 1966-06-30 Replacement, promoted Mrs Pierrette Huot * 1966-07-01 Mrs Pierrette Huot 1974-06-01 Classe I *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.