Collection search - Delmas
-
Record information – Brief Delmas
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:The BattlefordsEstablished:1906-07-01Province:SaskatchewanReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:13255 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Dwelling house rented by Postmaster - 1953-02-01Group 3/2Lot 15, NE Sec.31, Twp.45, R.18, W3 - 1953-02-01Sec.31, Twp.45, R.18, W3Sec.6, Twp.46, R.18, W3 - 1906-07-01Source:PSFDS03-(9531)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Reverend H. Delmas 1906-07-01 1906-09-04 Resignation John McFarlane 1906-12-01 1912-04-23 Resignation J. A. Roy 1912-06-30 1921-12 Resignation E. Gibault 1922-05-04 1926-11-18 Resignation Miss Jeanne Schiller 1927-06-22 1928-06-29 Resignation Achille Desjardins OAS 1874-03 1929-01-04 1944-06-22 Resignation Mrs. Leonne Louise Julia A. Blais * 1944-07-11 1949-08-11 Resignation Laurent Richard * 1949-10-01 1950-10-19 Resignation Laurence Marshall Young OAS * 1950-11-01 Acting Lawrence Marshall Young OAS * 1951-02-03 1952-12-29 Resignation Lawrence Edward Lambert * 1953-02-01 1955-02-08 * Dennis Joseph Douville * 1955-01-26 Acting Dennis Joseph Douville * 1955-06-16 1985-11-01 Resignation Alice Douville 1985-11-01 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.