Collection search - La Loche
-
Record information – Brief La Loche
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Meadow LakeEstablished:1926-07-10Province:SaskatchewanReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:10928 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Frequency of mail service once a monthGrade 4Hudson's Bay Co. StoreNorth of 56 parallelOther employment - Fur Trade Controller, Hudson's Bay Co.S0M 1G0UnsurveyedSource:PSFDS03-(10257)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Mr. Peat Cancelled F. Janvier 1989-07-15 Resignation Rev. J. B. Ducharme * Thos. Batchelor 1926-07-10 1931-06-08 Resignation Alexander Ahenakew 1887-01-28 1931-09-05 1936-09-07 Resignation Harry Ambrose * 1936-09-30 Acting Harry Ambrose * 1937-01-25 1937-06-17 Resignation Paul Giauque Williamson * 1937-07-22 Acting Paul Giauque Williamson * 1937-08-18 1938-06-13 Resignation Philip Joseph Power OAS 1885-11-17 1938-06-30 Philip Joseph Power OAS 1885-11-17 1938-08-30 1940-12-11 * David Robertson OAS 1896-03-23 1941-02-01 1947-01-29 Resignation Hugh Woodroffe Sutherland * 1947-07-16 1950-11-24 Resignation Richard Routledge Smith OAS * 1951-01-01 Acting Richard Routledge Smith OAS * 1951-01-17 1953-01 Resignation Richard Routledge Smith OAS * 1951-01-17 1953-01-09 Resignation John Derek Riley OAS * 1953-01-09 Acting John Derek Riley OAS * 1953-06-12 1955-05-25 Resignation Norman Graham Simpson OAS * 1955-05-01 Acting Norman Graham Simpson OAS * 1955-06-29 1968-03-01 Change in Postmaster only Wulfert A. Tolboom 1968-03-01 1972-11-16 Resignation Mr. Frank O. Petit 1972-11-18 1973-02-08 Resignation Mr. Raymond J. Dauvin 1973-02-09 Acting Mr. Raymond J. Dauvin 1973-04-02 1974-05-16 Resignation Miss Annette A. Herman 1974-05-17 Miss Annette A. Herman 1974-06-12 1974-10-29 * F. O. Petit 1974-10-29 1975-01-31 Resignation R. J. Dauvin 1975-01-31 R. J. Dauvin 1975-02-21 1979-09-29 Resignation Mrs. Pauline Fontaine 1979-10-23 Nives C. Foucault 1980-01-09 1985-06-27 Resignation Janice Laliberte 1985-06-28 1985-10-10 Returned to Beauval Bernice Park 1986-01-27 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.