Collection search - Killarney
-
Record information – Brief Killarney
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Algoma EastEstablished:1854-06-01Province:OntarioReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:10595 -
Record information – Details Additional information:but he refused the job when the opening date arrived and returnedcopied from a letter from the President of Manitoulin Historical Societydated 1956-01-08)Dwellingfor "Shebahanoning", Ontario with Robert Johnson as Postmaster,from the President of Manitoulin Historical Society dated 1956-01-08)Lake Huron - 1854-06-01Note: According to records in the George Ironside Papers inP0M 2A0the Detroit Public Library, a Post Office was arranged in 1853the paraphernalia which was later supplied to the "Killarnery Office",which was opened on the same location on 1854-06-01. (This informationSource:PSFDS03-(5262)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Robert Johnstone 1854-06-01 1858-06 Resignation Solomon Thebo 1858-08-01 1872-06 Resignation Charles de Lamorandiere 1873-01-01 1873 Resignation P.R. de Lamorandiere 1874-07-01 1877-02-06 Resignation Alexander Proulx 1877-04-01 1877-12-02 Resignation P.R. de Lamorandiere 1877-12-10 1878-11-22 Resignation Octave Lahaie 1879-04-01 1883-03-31 Resignation Miss P. de Lamorandiere 1883-07-01 1899-06-28 Resignation John J. Noble 1899-12-01 1903-04-09 Resignation J. de Lamorandiere 1903-05-01 1905-05-06 Resignation Thomas H. Jackman 1905-06-28 1917-09-09 Death Thomas Jackman 1917-10-20 1918-04-20 Resignation Paul Awad 1918-06-19 1918-08-12 Resignation Peter Salomon 1918-11-14 1919-10-20 Resignation Mrs. H.A. Loosemore 1919-09-20 1927-03-20 Change in site Thomas Henry Jackman 1927-10-01 1938-03-15 Resignation Mrs. Margaret Jackman 1887-02-18 1938-03-15 1959-01-13 Death Thomas Henry Jackman 1886-12-26 1959-01-14 Acting Arthur Jackman * 1961-01-14 Acting William George Dowling O.A.S. * 1961-09-11 1963-07-08 * Mrs. Sarah Christine Patfield * 1963-10-20 1975-05-09 Resignation Mrs. Lucille M. Burke 1975-05-09 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.