Collection search - St. Paul's Station
-
Record information – Brief St. Paul's Station
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:PerthEstablished:1875-04-01Province:OntarioReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:10207 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Downie - 1875-04-01RevenueStore owned by PM - 1953-11-19Store owned by PM's husband - 1956-11-01Source:PSFDS03-(6537)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Mrs. Bonnie L.J. Oakes 1976-05-18 Charles Wilson 1875-04-01 1876-07-10 Resignation T.H. Cairns 1877-04-01 1879-09-18 Resignation Thomas Kinsman 1880-04-01 1885-09-16 Resignation Mrs. Janet Thom 1910-10-05 1919-10-22 Resignation Frank P. Houck 1870-02 1920-03-15 1950-05-29 Resignation Mrs. Mary Minnie Hern 1890-09-25 1950-06-22 Acting Nelson George Dundas * 1951-07-17 Acting Nelson George Dundas * 1951-08-23 1953-10-26 Resignation Mrs. Mary Minnie Hern 1890-09-25 1953-11-19 Acting Mrs. Mary Minnie Hern 1890-09-25 1953-12-16 1954-10-11 Resignation Mrs. Georgina Elizabeth Bossence * 1954-11-09 Acting Mrs. Georgina Elizabeth Bossence * 1955-02-23 1956-10-11 Resignation Mrs. Irene May Keutsch * 1956-11-01 Acting Mrs. Irene May Keutsch * 1957-02-21 Terese L. Attinger 1976-05-19 Philip Rea 1983-06-18 Temporary A. Thom 1986-04-01 1910-08-24 Death *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.