Collection search - Butler
-
Record information – Brief Butler
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Brandon - SourisDate(s):Established Closing 1886-01-01 1966-10-07 Province:ManitobaReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:10121 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Dwelling - 1948-11-16Lot 23, Block 2, NE 1/4 Sec. 33, Twp. 9, R. 29, WPM - 1948-11-16Office permanently closed on the 7th October 1966 due to its limited usefulness and the lack of a suitable person being able to assume charge of this Office.Sec. 16, Twp. 10, R. 29, W1 - 1886-01-01Sec. 33, Twp. 9, R. 29, WPM - 1948-11-16StoreSource:PSFDS03-(8324)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy C.W. Wainewright 1886-01-01 1888-05-18 Resignation John P. Madge 1889-05-01 1899-03-10 * John Wright 1899-06-01 1908-12-21 Resignation Samuel Wright 1909-04-01 1910-07-16 Deceased David Rickie 1910-10-01 1913-04-11 Resignation Thomas A. Naylen 1913-06-04 1920-05-25 Resignation H.S. Bradley 1920-07-02 1926-01-13 Resignation Robert E. Saddler 1926-04-16 1928-11-02 Resignation Harry William Hovey OAS 1894-06 1928-11-22 1946-04-22 Resignation John Alexander Cruikshank * 1946-04-30 Acting John Alexander Cruikshank * 1946-08-07 1948-10-15 Resignation Edward Gordon Scott 1898-11-30 1948-11-16 Acting Edward Gordon Scott 1898-11-30 1948-11-30 1964-08-10 Resignation Mrs. Verna Ruth Atkinson * 1964-09-16 Acting Mrs. Verna Ruth Atkinson * 1964-10-09 1699-09-12 Resignation *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.