Collection search - Carnarvon
-
Record information – Brief Carnarvon
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Victoria - HaliburtonEstablished:1867-09-01Province:OntarioReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:9540 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Stanhope - 1867-09-01StoreSource:PSFDS03-(11489)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Andrew Barnum 1867-09-01 1869-02-16 Resignation Alfred Moore 1869-10-01 1877 Death Andrew Brown 1877-11-01 1882 Left the place Edward Sisson 1882-11-01 1897-02-06 * George P. Hart 1897-03-01 1906-10-18 Resignation Thomas H. Rogers 1860-11-24 1907-01-09 1943-09-06 Resignation Mrs. Christina Blanche Windsor * 1943-11-11 Acting Mrs. Christina Blanche Windsor * 1944-02-28 1949-10-10 Resignation Gordon Allcorn * 1949-10-27 Acting Gordon Allcorn * 1949-11-05 1962-01-04 Resignation Philip Allcorn * 1962-03-01 1964-05-16 Resignation Mrs. Margaret Olive Barnes * 1964-06-17 Acting Mrs. Margaret Olive Barnes * 1964-07-09 1970-07-10 Resignation Ian Forbes Gray * 1970-07-11 1983-02-15 Mrs. Shirley Gray * 1983-02-15 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.