Collection search - Cole Lake
-
Record information – Brief Cole Lake
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Hastings - FrontenacDate(s):Established Closing 1881-04-01 1961-11-14 Province:OntarioReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:8521 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Hinchinbrooke - 1881-04-01StoreSource:PSFDS03-(892)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Robert Killeins 1881-04-01 1882 Change in site Thomas Keats 1883-06-01 1884-07-09 Resignation George W. Killins 1885-03-01 1906-04-02 Resignation Arthur E. Harten 1906-05-01 1919-04-10 Resignation Robert Butterill 1919-05-24 1921 Resignation R.J. Jackson 1921-06-03 1928-03-30 Resignation Victor Edlan Kirkham 1928-05-03 1948-07-15 Resignation Walter Stanley Krysanouski * 1948-09-01 1952-09-27 * Robert John Wagar * 1952-10-31 Acting Robert John Wagar * 1953-02-04 1961-08-01 Resignation - closed *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.