Collection search - Bronte
-
Record information – Brief Bronte
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:HaltonEstablished:1851-06-06Now known as:Oakville-Bronte since 1958-11-01Province:OntarioReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:8088 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Trafalgar - 1851-06-06Source:PSFDS03-(556)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy E. Williams 1851-06-06 1862-05-08 Resignation Thomas C. Hagaman 1862-10-01 1864-11-29 Resignation E.C. Thompson 1865-04-01 1870-12 Resignation James Reach 1871-01-01 1871-07-19 Resignation Charles K. Jones 1871-10-01 1877-01-25 Resignation J.H. Thomas 1877-01-01 1878-03-01 Resignation G.K. McCraney 1878-04-01 1899-02-06 Death John Ingledew 1899-07-01 1902-02-27 Resignation W.W. Ingledew 1902-04-01 1905-07-13 Resignation J.S. Flumerfelt 1859-12 1905-08-08 1940-08-14 * Allie Orlando Flumerfelt 1886-08-06 1940-10-09 Acting Allie Orlando Flumerfelt 1886-08-06 1941-02-18 1955-08-06 Retirement Clifford Francis Reed * 1955-12-28 Acting Clifford Francis Reed * 1957-02-01 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.